AL HB421 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Self Service Storage Act, notification of default by email, default time reduced from 30 to 15 days, posting of notice on website, commercially reasonable sale specified, enforcement of owners' lien against member of armed forces time extended, Secs. 8-15-31, 8-15-34 am'd.; Secs. 8-15-39, 8-15-40 added
Title
Self Service Storage Act, notification of default by email, default time reduced from 30 to 15 days, posting of notice on website, commercially reasonable sale specified, enforcement of owners' lien against member of armed forces time extended, Secs. 8-15-31, 8-15-34 am'd.; Secs. 8-15-39, 8-15-40 added
Sponsors
Rep. K.L. Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities |
2014-03-05 | House | Engrossed |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 601 |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 600 |
2014-03-05 | House | Brown Amendment Offered |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 599 |
2014-03-05 | House | C&SB 2nd Amendment Offered |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 598 |
2014-03-05 | House | C&SB 1st Amendment Offered |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-12 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2014-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |