AL HB419 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Forwarded to Governor on April 7, 2022 at 6:15 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Forwarded to Governor on April 7, 2022 at 6:15 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Finance Dept., Division of Construction Management, inspections further provided for, reporting, recommendations provided, technical revisions, Secs. 16-1-2.4, 16-1-2.5, 41-4-400, 41-4-401 am'd.
Title
Finance Dept., Division of Construction Management, inspections further provided for, reporting, recommendations provided, technical revisions, Secs. 16-1-2.4, 16-1-2.5, 41-4-400, 41-4-401 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Ledbetter motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 971 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1021 (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Chesteen motion to Adopt Roll Call 1020 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 1019 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1018 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 641 (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 640 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - HBIR: Ledbetter motion to Adopt Roll Call 639 (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1021 (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Chesteen motion to Adopt Roll Call 1020 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 1019 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1018 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 641 (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 640 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - HBIR: Ledbetter motion to Adopt Roll Call 639 (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Forwarded to Governor on April 7, 2022 at 6:15 p.m. on April 7, 2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-367. |
2022-04-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-07 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2022-04-07 | House | Ledbetter motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 971 |
2022-04-07 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1021 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Chesteen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1020 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Gudger Amendment Offered |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1019 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Chambliss Amendment Offered |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1018 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2022-03-15 | House | Engrossed |
2022-03-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 641 |
2022-03-15 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 640 |
2022-03-15 | House | Education Policy Amendment Offered |
2022-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-03-01 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 2.4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 2.5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 4 | 400 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 4 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |