AL HB419 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Delivered to Governor at 2:45 p.m. on May 22, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Taxation, Financial Institution Excise Tax Reform Act of 2019, tax procedure further provided, prepaid estimated tax payments, transition rules, Secs. 40-16-1.2, 40-16-5.1, 40-16-10, 40-16-11 added; Sec. 40-16-5 repealed; Secs. 40-16-1, 40-16-3, 40-16-6 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation, Financial Institution Excise Tax Reform Act of 2019, tax procedure further provided, prepaid estimated tax payments, transition rules, Secs. 40-16-1.2, 40-16-5.1, 40-16-10, 40-16-11 added; Sec. 40-16-5 repealed; Secs. 40-16-1, 40-16-3, 40-16-6 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22HouseDelivered to Governor at 2:45 p.m. on May 22, 2019.
2019-05-22HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-284.
2019-05-22HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-22SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-21HouseEnrolled
2019-05-21HousePassed Second House
2019-05-21SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 957
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-16SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-08HouseEngrossed
2019-05-08SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
2019-05-08HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 573
2019-05-08HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 572
2019-05-08HouseSouth Amendment Offered
2019-05-08HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 571
2019-05-08HouseWays and Means General Fund Amendment Offered
2019-05-08HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2019-04-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB419&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB419-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB419-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB419-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199452-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/200144-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=617212&VOTE=571&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=617220&VOTE=572&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=617221&VOTE=573&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=621225&VOTE=957&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback