AL HB416 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Delivered to Governor at 4:45 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Delivered to Governor at 4:45 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Real Estate Commission, renewal research and education fee, increased, distribute proceeds to Alabama Center for Real Estate, Sec. 34-27-35 am'd.
Title
Real Estate Commission, renewal research and education fee, increased, distribute proceeds to Alabama Center for Real Estate, Sec. 34-27-35 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:45 p.m. on April 3, 2014. |
2014-04-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-443. |
2014-04-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-04-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-04-03 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1179 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2014-03-11 | House | Engrossed |
2014-03-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 695 |
2014-03-11 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 694 |
2014-03-11 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment Offered |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-12 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |