AL HB407 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

State Seal of Biliteracy, established, recognizing graduates with the proficiency in English and at least one world language, including American sign language

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Seal of Biliteracy, established, recognizing graduates with the proficiency in English and at least one world language, including American sign language

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 321 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 320 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - HBIR: Collins motion to Adopt Roll Call 319 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18SenatePending third reading on day 17 Favorable from Education Policy
2021-03-18SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-03-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
2021-03-09HouseEngrossed
2021-03-09HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 321
2021-03-09HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 320
2021-03-09HouseCollins Amendment Offered
2021-03-09HouseThird Reading Passed
2021-02-24HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-02-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB407&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB407-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB407-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/210974-1.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41905.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42375.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=650094&VOTE=319&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20HB407&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=650101&VOTE=320&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=650118&VOTE=321&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback