AL HB40 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-07 - Pending third reading on day 7 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles, National Guard tags, exemption applicable to other plates, insurance, evidence by electronic format, Revenue Department authorized to send notices in electronic format, Sec. 32-7A-26 added; Secs. 31-2-12, 32-6-110, 32-7A-6, 40-12-244 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles, National Guard tags, exemption applicable to other plates, insurance, evidence by electronic format, Revenue Department authorized to send notices in electronic format, Sec. 32-7A-26 added; Secs. 31-2-12, 32-6-110, 32-7A-6, 40-12-244 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 24) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-07SenatePending third reading on day 7 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund
2015-08-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2015-08-06HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 28
2015-08-06HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-08-04HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback