AL HB4 | 2015 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-15 - Forwarded to Executive Department on September 15, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Jasper, civil service board, compensation, further provided for, Act 113, 1965 First Special Session, am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jasper, civil service board, compensation, further provided for, Act 113, 1965 First Special Session, am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 35 Abs: 36) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-15HouseForwarded to Executive Department on September 15, 2015
2015-09-15HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-549.
2015-09-15HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-09-15HouseEnrolled
2015-09-15SenateSignature Requested
2015-09-15HousePassed Second House
2015-09-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 37
2015-09-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-09-14SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-09-11SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2015-09-11HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 22
2015-09-11HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-09-10HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-09-08HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback