AL HB4 | 2012 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-23 - Pending third reading on day 6 Favorable from Local Legislation No. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Baldwin Co., Stockton Landmark District, boundaries defined, annexation by local law prohibited, Act 2011-316, 2011 Reg. Sess., repealed, const. amend

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baldwin Co., Stockton Landmark District, boundaries defined, annexation by local law prohibited, Act 2011-316, 2011 Reg. Sess., repealed, const. amend

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-11-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 36) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-23 Pending third reading on day 6 Favorable from Local Legislation No. 1
2012-05-23 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-05-22 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
2012-05-21 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1
2012-05-21 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-18 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-05-17 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback