AL HB398 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 6:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 6:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Randolph Co., sheriff's pistol permit fee, waiver for active or retired law enforcement officers, Act 89-446, 1989 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Title
Randolph Co., sheriff's pistol permit fee, waiver for active or retired law enforcement officers, Act 89-446, 1989 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Senate - Dial table Dial motion to recommit (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - Senate - Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 61 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2013-05-09 - Senate - Dial table Dial motion to recommit (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - Senate - Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 61 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 6:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-323. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1058 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Dial table Dial motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 949 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 687 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Smitherman motion to rerefer |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2013-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 513 |
2013-04-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-03-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |