AL HB395 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Forwarded to Governor on April 5, 2022 at 3:29 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Forwarded to Governor on April 5, 2022 at 3:29 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages, Hospitality Management Program license at certain state universities, activities under license authorized, license fee
Title
Alcoholic beverages, Hospitality Management Program license at certain state universities, activities under license authorized, license fee
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Lovvorn [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - Lovvorn motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 884 (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 904 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Whatley motion to Adopt Roll Call 903 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - SBIR: Whatley motion to Adopt Roll Call 902 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 522 (Y: 76 N: 8 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 521 (Y: 81 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 520 (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - HBIR: Lovvorn motion to Adopt Roll Call 519 (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 904 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Whatley motion to Adopt Roll Call 903 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - SBIR: Whatley motion to Adopt Roll Call 902 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 522 (Y: 76 N: 8 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 521 (Y: 81 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 520 (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - HBIR: Lovvorn motion to Adopt Roll Call 519 (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Forwarded to Governor on April 5, 2022 at 3:29 p.m. |
2022-04-05 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-360. |
2022-04-05 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-05 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2022-04-05 | House | Lovvorn motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 884 |
2022-04-05 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 904 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Whatley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 903 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Smitherman Amendment Offered |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed |
2022-03-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 522 |
2022-03-09 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 521 |
2022-03-09 | House | Harbison Amendment Offered |
2022-03-09 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 520 |
2022-03-09 | House | Economic Development and Tourism Amendment Offered |
2022-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-02-22 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |