AL HB391 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Delivered to Governor at 2:12 p.m. on April 20, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Schools, public K-12, athletic events allowing competition by one biological gender against another prohibited unless the event specifically includes both genders

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools, public K-12, athletic events allowing competition by one biological gender against another prohibited unless the event specifically includes both genders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1008 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt Roll Call 1007 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Stadthagen motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 890 (Y: 76 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Gudger motion to Adopt Roll Call 986 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Gudger motion to Adopt Roll Call 985 (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - SBIR: Gudger motion to Adopt Roll Call 984 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 480 (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question Roll Call 479 (Y: 74 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - HBIR: Stadthagen motion to Adopt Roll Call 478 (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20HouseDelivered to Governor at 2:12 p.m. on April 20, 2021.
2021-04-20HouseAssigned Act No. 2021-285.
2021-04-20HouseClerk of the House Certification
2021-04-20SenateSignature Requested
2021-04-20SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2021-04-15HouseEnrolled
2021-04-15HouseStadthagen motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 890
2021-04-15HouseConcurrence Requested
2021-04-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1008
2021-04-15SenateFigures motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1007
2021-04-15SenateFigures Amendment Offered
2021-04-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-04-15SenateGudger motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2021-04-15SenateGudger motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 986
2021-04-15SenateGudger Amendment Offered
2021-04-15SenateGudger motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 985
2021-04-15SenateEducation Policy Amendment Offered
2021-04-15SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2021-04-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2021-03-18SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
2021-03-18HouseGrimsley and Scott intended to vote "Yea"
2021-03-18HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 480
2021-03-18HouseLedbetter motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 479
2021-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed
2021-02-24HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-02-10HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB391&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB391-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB391-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/212393-4.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/213367-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/213408-1.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41925.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42463.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42504.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42185.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41499.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=653111&VOTE=478&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20HB391&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=653154&VOTE=479&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=653157&VOTE=480&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=658475&VOTE=984&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20HB391&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=658485&VOTE=985&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=658487&VOTE=986&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=659030&VOTE=890&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=658899&VOTE=1007&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=658900&VOTE=1008&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback