AL HB391 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on February 25, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on February 25, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Monroeville, corp. limits alt.
Title
Monroeville, corp. limits alt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on February 25, 2010. | |
2010-02-25 | Assigned Act No. 2010-136 on 03/04/2010. | |
2010-02-25 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-02-25 | Signature Requested | |
2010-02-23 | Enrolled | |
2010-02-23 | Passed Second House | |
2010-02-23 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 342 | |
2010-02-23 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-18 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-02 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2010-01-28 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 132 | |
2010-01-28 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-21 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |