AL HB376 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers' Retirement System and Employees' Retirement System, to revise temporarily the eligibility and compensation of retirees for participating in either system after retirement, Secs. 16-25-25.2, 36-27-8.3 added; Secs. 16-25-26, 36-27-8.2 am'd.
Title
Teachers' Retirement System and Employees' Retirement System, to revise temporarily the eligibility and compensation of retirees for participating in either system after retirement, Secs. 16-25-25.2, 36-27-8.3 added; Secs. 16-25-26, 36-27-8.2 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 530 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - HBIR: Reynolds motion to Adopt Roll Call 529 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - HBIR: Reynolds motion to Adopt Roll Call 529 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2022-03-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 530 |
2022-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 25 | 25.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 25 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 27 | 8.2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 27 | 8.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |