AL HB374 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Forwarded to Governor on May 28, 2019 at 5:05 p.m. on May 28, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Forwarded to Governor on May 28, 2019 at 5:05 p.m. on May 28, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Baldwin Co., Law Library and Judicial Administration Fund, court costs collected for operation, further authorized, Sec. 45-2-80.87 am'd.
Title
Baldwin Co., Law Library and Judicial Administration Fund, court costs collected for operation, further authorized, Sec. 45-2-80.87 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 81 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 81 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 28, 2019 at 5:05 p.m. on May 28, 2019. |
2019-05-28 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-354. |
2019-05-28 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-28 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-28 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1169 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-04-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 232 |
2019-04-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |