AL HB364 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to education; to require a public K-12 school, a local board of education, and certain event organizers to accept certain forms of payment for admission to certain school-sponsored events.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to education; to require a public K-12 school, a local board of education, and certain event organizers to accept certain forms of payment for admission to certain school-sponsored events.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-24 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Adopt 1FYDZ3-1 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-25HouseEnacted
2023-05-25HouseEnrolled
2023-05-25SenateReady to Enroll
2023-05-24SenateRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-05-24SenateOn Third Reading in Second House
2023-05-11SenateRead Second Time in Second House
2023-05-10SenateReported Out of Committee in Second House
2023-05-10SenateReported Favorably from Senate Education Policy
2023-05-03SenateReferred to Committee to Senate Education Policy
2023-05-03HouseRead First Time in Second House
2023-05-02HouseRead a Third Time and Pass as Amended
2023-05-02HouseAdopt 1FYDZ3-1
2023-05-02HouseOn Third Reading in House of Origin
2023-04-27HouseRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-04-26HouseReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-04-26HouseReported Favorably from House Education Policy
2023-04-20HouseIntroduced and Referred to House Education Policy
2023-04-20HouseRead First Time in House of Origin

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/HB364-int.pdf
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/HB364-eng.pdf
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/HB364-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/1FYDZ3-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-LOGUAY-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-LOGUAY-2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc513
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc514
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc1013

Bill Comments

feedback