AL HB364 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Delivered to Governor at 1:06 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Delivered to Governor at 1:06 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prescription drugs, federally-qualified health centers authorized to deliver medications except controlled substances to clinics, Sec. 34-23-70 am'd.
Title
Prescription drugs, federally-qualified health centers authorized to deliver medications except controlled substances to clinics, Sec. 34-23-70 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Sells [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:06 p.m. on March 22, 2018. |
2018-03-22 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-463. |
2018-03-22 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-22 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-22 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 999 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |
2018-02-27 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 530 |
2018-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-01 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |