AL HB360 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Clerk of the House Certification
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Clerk of the House Certification
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Foundation Program Fund, local boards of education authorized to establish local school calendar providing 180 instructional days for computation of benefits, Flexible School Calendar Act, Sec. 16-13-231 am'd.; Act 2011-235, 2011 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Title
Foundation Program Fund, local boards of education authorized to establish local school calendar providing 180 instructional days for computation of benefits, Flexible School Calendar Act, Sec. 16-13-231 am'd.; Act 2011-235, 2011 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Davis [R] | Rep. Joe Faust [R] | Rep. Chad Fincher [R] | Rep. Craig Ford [D] |
Rep. Mike Hill [R] | Rep. James Ison [R] | Rep. Steve McMillan [R] | Rep. Mark Tuggle [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-11 - Senate - Marsh motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - Davis motion to Read a Third Time, Objection to the Contrary Not Withstanding (Y: 71 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - Davis motion to Non Concur (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - Davis motion to Table (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - Davis motion to again Concur In and Adopt (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 8 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 8 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Pittman motion to Table (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - Davis motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 79) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 62 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - Davis motion to Read a Third Time, Objection to the Contrary Not Withstanding (Y: 71 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - Davis motion to Non Concur (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - Davis motion to Table (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - Davis motion to again Concur In and Adopt (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 8 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 8 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Pittman motion to Table (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - Davis motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 79) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 62 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-16 | Second House Concurs in Veto Override | |
2012-05-10 | Marsh motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding adopted Roll Call 1378 | |
2012-05-10 | Executive Amendment | |
2012-05-10 | Further Consideration of Executive Amendment | |
2012-05-10 | Marsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-10 | Further Consideration of Executive Amendment | |
2012-05-09 | Marsh Motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-09 | Motion to Read a Third Time, Veto to the Contrary Not Withstanding pending | |
2012-05-09 | House of Origin Non-Concurs in Executive Amendment | |
2012-05-09 | McCutcheon, Johnson (W), Ball, Williams (P), Patterson, Hall and Sanderford intended to vote "Nay" | |
2012-05-08 | Davis motion to Read a Third Time, Objection to the Contrary Not Withstanding adopted Roll Call 1375 | |
2012-05-08 | Davis motion to Non Concur adopted Roll Call 1374 | |
2012-05-08 | Davis motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1373 | |
2012-05-08 | DeMarco motion to Concur In and Adopt tabled | |
2012-05-08 | Davis motion to Non Concur offered | |
2012-05-08 | Executive Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-08 | Forwarded to Governor | |
2012-05-01 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-01 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-01 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-01 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2012-05-01 | Davis motion to again Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1127 | |
2012-05-01 | Davis motion to reconsider adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-01 | Davis motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1126 | |
2012-05-01 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-05-01 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 851 | |
2012-05-01 | Holtzclaw motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 850 | |
2012-05-01 | Holtzclaw Amendment No. 2 Offered. | |
2012-05-01 | Petition to Cease Debate lost Roll Call 849 | |
2012-05-01 | Sanford motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 848 | |
2012-05-01 | Sanford Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-01 | Pittman motion to Table adopted Roll Call 847 | |
2012-05-01 | Holtzclaw Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-01 | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 846 | |
2012-05-01 | Dial Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-01 | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 845 | |
2012-05-01 | Tourism and Marketing Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-01 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-19 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-04-17 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism and Marketing | |
2012-04-12 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-12 | Cosponsors Added | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 709 | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 708 | |
2012-04-12 | Education Policy Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-12 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |