AL HB356 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Forwarded to Governor on April 1, 2014 at 8:52 p.m. on April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Forwarded to Governor on April 1, 2014 at 8:52 p.m. on April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fishing, additional licenses, new resident and nonresident state lake fishing license, new nonresident 3-day license, public fishing pier and annual saltwater fishing pier licenses, disabled 3-day fishing license, Sec. 9-11-56.3 am'd.
Title
Fishing, additional licenses, new resident and nonresident state lake fishing license, new nonresident 3-day license, public fishing pier and annual saltwater fishing pier licenses, disabled 3-day fishing license, Sec. 9-11-56.3 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Jones [R] | Rep. Chad Fincher [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Forwarded to Governor on April 1, 2014 at 8:52 p.m. on April 1, 2014. |
2014-04-01 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-340. |
2014-04-01 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-04-01 | House | Enrolled |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-04-01 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1105 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |
2014-03-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 643 |
2014-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-12 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |