AL HB345 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Election, clarifying the distance from a polling place within which an individual may not campaign, Sec. 17-9-50 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election, clarifying the distance from a polling place within which an individual may not campaign, Sec. 17-9-50 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - House - Drake motion to Remove from Table pending Roll Call 924 (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Drake motion to Table Roll Call 923 (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - HBIR: Drake motion to Adopt Roll Call 922 (Y: 79 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06HouseIndefinitely Postponed
2021-04-20HouseDrake motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2021-04-20HouseDrake motion to Remove from Table pending Roll Call 924
2021-04-20HouseDrake motion to Withdraw his Amendment adopted Voice Vote
2021-04-20HouseDrake Amendment Offered
2021-04-20HouseDrake motion to Table adopted Roll Call 923
2021-04-20HouseConstitution, Campaigns and Elections Amendment Offered
2021-04-20HouseThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2021-03-03HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2021-02-04HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17950Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB345&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB345-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/211144-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/213448-1.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42041.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42150.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=659764&VOTE=922&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20HB345&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=659813&VOTE=923&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=659926&VOTE=924&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments 750

feedback