AL HB344 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tax Assessor or Revenue Commissioner, homestead exemptions, electronic verification at the discretion of tax assessing official, Sec. 40-9-21.1 am'd.
Title
Tax Assessor or Revenue Commissioner, homestead exemptions, electronic verification at the discretion of tax assessing official, Sec. 40-9-21.1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1231 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Price motion to Adopt Roll Call 1230 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Faulkner motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1065 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SBIR: Sessions motion to Adopt Roll Call 1076 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 318 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - HBIR: Faulkner motion to Adopt Roll Call 317 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Price motion to Adopt Roll Call 1230 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Faulkner motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1065 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SBIR: Sessions motion to Adopt Roll Call 1076 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 318 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - HBIR: Faulkner motion to Adopt Roll Call 317 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on May 4, 2021. |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-422. |
2021-05-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2021-04-29 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | Faulkner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1065 |
2021-04-29 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1231 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Price motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1230 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Price Amendment Offered |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Sessions motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2021-03-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 318 |
2021-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |