AL HB334 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Read Second Time in Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Read Second Time in Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To create the Students with Unique Needs (SUN) Education Scholarship Account Act and Program; to allow parents to use funds in an education scholarship account to provide an individualized education program for their children.
Title
To create the Students with Unique Needs (SUN) Education Scholarship Account Act and Program; to allow parents to use funds in an education scholarship account to provide an individualized education program for their children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 99 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - Adopt AH3AQ7-1 (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - Adopt 5EWPM6-1 (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - Adopt AH3AQ7-1 (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - Adopt 5EWPM6-1 (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2023-05-16 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-11 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended |
2023-05-11 | House | Adopt AH3AQ7-1 |
2023-05-11 | House | Adopt 5EWPM6-1 |
2023-05-11 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-05-03 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported Favorably from House Ways and Means Education |
2023-05-03 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means Education 5EWPM6-1 |
2023-05-03 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means Education BUN344-1 |
2023-05-01 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means Education ZE0ARK-1 |
2023-04-26 | House | Carry Over by House Ways and Means Education |
2023-04-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Ways and Means Education |
2023-04-18 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |