AL HB322 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Forwarded to Governor on May 6, 2021 at 9:32 p.m. on May 6, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Forwarded to Governor on May 6, 2021 at 9:32 p.m. on May 6, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Foresters, assigns responsibility for naming successor members of State Board of Registration for Foresters to the Division of the Society of American Foresters and any other organization meeting certain criteria, Sec. 34-12-30 am'd.
Title
Foresters, assigns responsibility for naming successor members of State Board of Registration for Foresters to the Division of the Society of American Foresters and any other organization meeting certain criteria, Sec. 34-12-30 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1388 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1387 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 760 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - HBIR: Crawford motion to Adopt Roll Call 759 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1387 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 760 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - HBIR: Crawford motion to Adopt Roll Call 759 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 6, 2021 at 9:32 p.m. on May 6, 2021. |
2021-05-06 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-433. |
2021-05-06 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-05-06 | House | Enrolled |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1388 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry |
2021-04-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 760 |
2021-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |