AL HB320 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Forwarded to Governor at 2:07 p.m. on April 29, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Forwarded to Governor at 2:07 p.m. on April 29, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State employees, cost-of-living increase for fiscal year beginning October 1, 2021.
Title
State employees, cost-of-living increase for fiscal year beginning October 1, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1202 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - SBIR: Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1201 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 316 (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - HBIR: Lawrence motion to Adopt Roll Call 315 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - SBIR: Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1201 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 316 (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - HBIR: Lawrence motion to Adopt Roll Call 315 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 2:07 p.m. on April 29, 2021. |
2021-04-29 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-338. |
2021-04-29 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-29 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1202 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2021-03-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 316 |
2021-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |