AL HB319 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-01 - Carry Over to the Call of the Chair
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board; to amend Sections 28-11-2, 28-11-3, 28-11-5, 28-11-6.1, 28-11-6.2, 28-11-7, 28-11-9, 28-11-10, 28-11-12, 28-11-13, 28-11-14, 28-11-16, 28-11-17.1, 28-11-18, 28-11-19, Code of Alabama 1975, to revise the definition of "electronic nicotine delivery system" to include delivery of substances other than tobacco; to further provide for the sale of tobacco and other related products to minors; to prohibit the distribution of tobacco, tobacco products, electronic nicotine delivery systems, e-liquids, and alternative nicotine products through a vending machine; to provide license fees for the retail sale of certain tobacco products; to further provide for the authorized penalties for certain violations; to establish the Tobacco Licensing and Compliance Fund in the State Treasury and provide for its administration; to further provide for the membership of the advisory board to the Alcoholic Beverages Control Board; to further provide for the requirement of tobacco retailers to post signage warning of the dangers of tobacco product use; to require the board to adopt rules; to require the State Board of Education to establish a model vaping awareness, education, and prevention program and require each local board of education to adopt a policy based on the model policy; to repeal Section 28-11-15, Code of Alabama 1975, and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board; to amend Sections 28-11-2, 28-11-3, 28-11-5, 28-11-6.1, 28-11-6.2, 28-11-7, 28-11-9, 28-11-10, 28-11-12, 28-11-13, 28-11-14, 28-11-16, 28-11-17.1, 28-11-18, 28-11-19, Code of Alabama 1975, to revise the definition of "electronic nicotine delivery system" to include delivery of substances other than tobacco; to further provide for the sale of tobacco and other related products to minors; to prohibit the distribution of tobacco, tobacco products, electronic nicotine delivery systems, e-liquids, and alternative nicotine products through a vending machine; to provide license fees for the retail sale of certain tobacco products; to further provide for the authorized penalties for certain violations; to establish the Tobacco Licensing and Compliance Fund in the State Treasury and provide for its administration; to further provide for the membership of the advisory board to the Alcoholic Beverages Control Board; to further provide for the requirement of tobacco retailers to post signage warning of the dangers of tobacco product use; to require the board to adopt rules; to require the State Board of Education to establish a model vaping awareness, education, and prevention program and require each local board of education to adopt a policy based on the model policy; to repeal Section 28-11-15, Code of Alabama 1975, and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-16 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - House - Adopt ZSZ9RK-1 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - House - Adopt 85Q5H2-1 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-01SenateCarry Over to the Call of the Chair
2023-06-01SenateOn Third Reading in Second House
2023-05-24SenateRead Second Time in Second House
2023-05-24SenateReported Out of Committee in Second House
2023-05-24SenateReported Favorably from Senate Judiciary
2023-05-23SenateAmendment/Substitute by Senate Judiciary 79O3EV-1
2023-05-16SenateReferred to Committee to Senate Judiciary
2023-05-16HouseRead First Time in Second House
2023-05-16HouseRead a Third Time and Pass as Amended
2023-05-16HouseAdopt ZSZ9RK-1
2023-05-16HouseAdopt 85Q5H2-1
2023-05-16HouseOn Third Reading in House of Origin
2023-05-03HouseRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-05-03HouseReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-05-03HouseReported Favorably from House Judiciary
2023-05-03HouseAmendment/Substitute by House Judiciary 85Q5H2-1
2023-04-13HouseIntroduced and Referred to House Boards, Agencies and Commissions
2023-04-13HouseRead First Time in House of Origin

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/HB319-int.pdf
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/HB319-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/85Q5H2-1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/ZSZ9RK-1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/79O3EV-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-D1I2HT-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-D1I2HT-2.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-D1I2HT-3.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-D1I2HT-4.pdf
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc682
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc683
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc684

Bill Comments

feedback