AL HB319 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Assigned Act No. 2022-177.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Assigned Act No. 2022-177.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Constitution, authorizing Code Commissioner, upon ratification of an official Constitution of Alabama of 2022, to make certain revisions, const. amend.
Title
Constitution, authorizing Code Commissioner, upon ratification of an official Constitution of Alabama of 2022, to make certain revisions, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 683 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 682 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 335 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - HBIR: Bracy motion to Adopt Roll Call 334 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 682 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 335 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - HBIR: Bracy motion to Adopt Roll Call 334 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-177. |
2022-03-29 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 3:38 p.m. on March 29.2022. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-03-29 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-03-17 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-17 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 683 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2022-02-24 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 335 |
2022-02-24 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |