AL HB301 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Community development districts, add'l type authorized, marina on lake, sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises, Secs. 35-8B-1, 35-8B-2, 35-8B-3 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community development districts, add'l type authorized, marina on lake, sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises, Secs. 35-8B-1, 35-8B-2, 35-8B-3 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 16 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21SenateFurther Consideration
2018-03-21SenateLivingston motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-21SenateFiscal Responsibility and Economic Development first Substitute Offered
2018-03-21SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2018-03-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2018-03-08SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
2018-03-08HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 642
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-15HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-25HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback