AL HB3 | 2015 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-16 - Assigned Act No. 2015-535.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Cigarettes, tax increased, discount on tobacco tax stamps lowered, Indian tribal refunds, further provided for, tax on vapor products, distrib. for Medicaid, Sec. 40-25-2.2 added; Secs. 40-23-1, 40-23-35, 40-25-2, 40-25-5 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cigarettes, tax increased, discount on tobacco tax stamps lowered, Indian tribal refunds, further provided for, tax on vapor products, distrib. for Medicaid, Sec. 40-25-2.2 added; Secs. 40-23-1, 40-23-35, 40-25-2, 40-25-5 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-15 - House - Rowe motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 52 N: 42 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-09-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-15 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 9 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-09-15 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-09-15 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-09-15 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 7 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-09-15 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 8 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-09-15 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - House - Rowe motion to Table (Y: 57 N: 15 NV: 15 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - House - Ainsworth motion to question of the ruling of the chair (Y: 4 N: 75 NV: 10 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2015-09-10 - House - Rowe motion to Table (Y: 54 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 62 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-16HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-535.
2015-09-16HouseForwarded to Governor on September 16, 2015 at 11:13 a.m. on September 16, 2015.
2015-09-16HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-09-16HouseEnrolled
2015-09-16SenateSignature Requested
2015-09-16SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2015-09-15HouseRowe motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 62
2015-09-15HouseConcurrence Requested
2015-09-15SenateDial motion to Reconsider and Table Adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 49
2015-09-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-09-15SenateHolley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-15SenateHoltzclaw motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 46
2015-09-15SenateHoltzclaw Amendment Offered
2015-09-15SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 45
2015-09-15SenateOrr Amendment Offered
2015-09-15SenateDial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 44
2015-09-15SenateDial Amendment Offered
2015-09-15SenateDial motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 43
2015-09-15SenateDial Amendment Offered
2015-09-15SenateDial motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 42
2015-09-15SenateDial Amendment Offered
2015-09-15SenateWilliams motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-15SenateDial Amendment Offered
2015-09-15SenateDial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 41
2015-09-15SenateFinance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
2015-09-15SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2015-09-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-09-10SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2015-09-10HouseJones filed Conflict of Interest Declaration
2015-09-10HouseHill (J) intended to vote "Yea" and Harbinson intended to vote "Nay"
2015-09-10HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 9
2015-09-10HouseRowe motion to Table adopted Roll Call 8
2015-09-10HouseHolmes (M) Amendment Offered
2015-09-10HouseWarren intended to vote "Nay"
2015-09-10HouseAinsworth motion to question of the ruling of the chair lost Roll Call 7
2015-09-10HouseRowe motion to Table adopted Roll Call 6
2015-09-10HouseAinsworth Amendment Offered
2015-09-10HouseClouse motion to Table adopted Roll Call 5
2015-09-10HouseShedd Amendment Offered
2015-09-10HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-09-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-09-08HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB3
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015SS/PrintFiles/HB3-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=530593&VOTE=5&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=530595&VOTE=6&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=530596&VOTE=7&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=530598&VOTE=8&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=530599&VOTE=9&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531657&VOTE=41&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531713&VOTE=42&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531717&VOTE=43&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531749&VOTE=44&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531751&VOTE=45&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531755&VOTE=46&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531759&VOTE=49&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531766&VOTE=62&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback