AL HB293 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State Fire Marshal, permit fees, collected for permit to manufacture a destructive device or biological weapon be deposited in State Fire Marshal's Fund, Act 2016-414, 2016 Reg. Sess., am'd; Sec. 36-19-2.1 am'd.
Title
State Fire Marshal, permit fees, collected for permit to manufacture a destructive device or biological weapon be deposited in State Fire Marshal's Fund, Act 2016-414, 2016 Reg. Sess., am'd; Sec. 36-19-2.1 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2017-04-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-07 | House | Rereferred from PS&HS to Insurance |
2017-02-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |