AL HB29 | 2015 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-16 - Conference Committee on HB29 2015SS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Education Trust Fund, Rolling Reserve, appropriation cap further provided for; additional use of revenue in the ETF Budget Stabilization Fund authorized, including payments to the PACT Fund; prohibited appropriations from holding or clearing accounts; Secs. 29-9-3, 29-9-4, 29-9-5, 29-9-6 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education Trust Fund, Rolling Reserve, appropriation cap further provided for; additional use of revenue in the ETF Budget Stabilization Fund authorized, including payments to the PACT Fund; prohibited appropriations from holding or clearing accounts; Secs. 29-9-3, 29-9-4, 29-9-5, 29-9-6 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-15 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-15 - House - Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 83 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-14 - House - Poole motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-09-14 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-14 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-09-14 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-09-14 - House - Poole motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-09-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-09-14 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-09-14 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 88 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-16HouseConference Committee on HB29 2015SS first Substitute Offered
2015-09-16HouseForwarded to Executive Department
2015-09-16HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-538.
2015-09-16HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-09-16SenateSignature Requested
2015-09-15HouseEnrolled
2015-09-15HouseConcurred in Conference Report
2015-09-15SenateMarsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 48
2015-09-15SenateConference Report Concurrence Requested
2015-09-15HouseWilliams (JW), Warren, Drummond and Hurst intended to vote "Yea"
2015-09-15HousePoole motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 49
2015-09-15HouseConference Report
2015-09-14HouseAlexander intended to vote "Yea"
2015-09-14SenateMarsh motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 32 P&PO appoints Orr, Pittman and Marsh
2015-09-14HouseConference Committee Appointed
2015-09-14SenateConference Committee Requested
2015-09-14HouseRepresentative Alexander intended to vote "Yea"
2015-09-14HousePoole motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 45 House appoints Poole, Scott and Tuggle
2015-09-14HouseConcurrence Requested
2015-09-14SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 31
2015-09-14SenateSanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 30
2015-09-14SenateSanford Amendment Offered
2015-09-14SenateHolley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 29
2015-09-14SenateHolley Amendment Offered
2015-09-14SenateBussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 28
2015-09-14SenateBussman Amendment Offered
2015-09-14SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 27
2015-09-14SenateOrr first Substitute Offered
2015-09-14SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-09-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-09-10HouseEngrossed
2015-09-10SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2015-09-10HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 17
2015-09-10HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 16
2015-09-10HouseWays and Means Education Amendment Offered
2015-09-10HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-09-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-09-08HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB29
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015SS/PrintFiles/HB29-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=530692&VOTE=16&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=530710&VOTE=17&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531399&VOTE=27&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531401&VOTE=28&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531406&VOTE=31&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531414&VOTE=45&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531424&VOTE=32&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531403&VOTE=29&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531405&VOTE=30&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531444&VOTE=45&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531615&VOTE=49&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531746&VOTE=48&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback