AL HB281 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Delivered to Governor at 2:22 p.m. on May 6, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Delivered to Governor at 2:22 p.m. on May 6, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax, historic structures, qualified rehabilitation, tax credits extended to 2027, residential structures disqualified, admin. by Historical Commission, Secs. 40-9F-31, 40-9F-32, 40-9F-33, 40-9F-36, 40-9F-38 am'd.
Title
Income tax, historic structures, qualified rehabilitation, tax credits extended to 2027, residential structures disqualified, admin. by Historical Commission, Secs. 40-9F-31, 40-9F-32, 40-9F-33, 40-9F-36, 40-9F-38 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - House - Gaston motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1124 (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1312 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 1311 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt Roll Call 1221 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - SBIR: Waggoner motion to Adopt Roll Call 1220 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 218 (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 217 (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - HBIR: Gaston motion to Adopt Roll Call 216 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1312 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 1311 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt Roll Call 1221 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - SBIR: Waggoner motion to Adopt Roll Call 1220 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 218 (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 217 (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - HBIR: Gaston motion to Adopt Roll Call 216 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:22 p.m. on May 6, 2021. |
2021-05-06 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-431. |
2021-05-06 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-05-06 | House | Enrolled |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2021-05-06 | House | Gaston motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1124 |
2021-05-06 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1312 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1311 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Chambliss Amendment Offered |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1221 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Waggoner Amendment Offered |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2021-02-25 | House | Engrossed |
2021-02-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 218 |
2021-02-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 217 |
2021-02-25 | House | Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered |
2021-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 9F | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 9F | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 9F | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 9F | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 9F | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |