AL HB27 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-24 - Ways and Means General Fund first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-24 - Ways and Means General Fund first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid, prescription drugs, supplemental tax of 15 cents per prescription by Act 2015-537, refunds as tax credit against original prescription drug taxes due, commencing October 1, 2016, Act 2015-537, 2015 Second Sp. Sess., repealed
Title
Medicaid, prescription drugs, supplemental tax of 15 cents per prescription by Act 2015-537, refunds as tax credit against original prescription drug taxes due, commencing October 1, 2016, Act 2015-537, 2015 Second Sp. Sess., repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-24 | House | Ways and Means General Fund first Amendment Offered |
2016-08-24 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:47 a.m. on August 24, 2016. |
2016-08-24 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-452. |
2016-08-24 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-08-23 | House | Enrolled |
2016-08-23 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 44 |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Beasley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-08-17 | House | Engrossed |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism and Marketing |
2016-08-17 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2016-08-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 21 |
2016-08-17 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 20 |
2016-08-17 | House | Ways and Means General Fund Amendment Offered |
2016-08-17 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 19 |
2016-08-17 | House | Ways and Means General Fund first Substitute Offered |
2016-08-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-08-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment |
2016-08-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |