AL HB25 | 2012 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - Forwarded to Governor on May 24, 2012 at 2:47 a. m. on May 24, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Children First Trust Fund, appropriations from for fiscal year ending September 30, 2012, use of allocation pursuant to Section 41-15B-2.2 and this act, tobacco settlement revenues deposited in fund within 30 days of receipt, Finance Director to notify each agency of allocation, appropriations conditional on tobacco revenues, appropriation of additional tobacco settlement funds, audit, Children's Affairs Department to report to Legislature and Children's Policy Council, appropriations from General Fund to various entities contingent upon adoption of const. amend. proposed by SB147, 2012 Reg. Sess.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children First Trust Fund, appropriations from for fiscal year ending September 30, 2012, use of allocation pursuant to Section 41-15B-2.2 and this act, tobacco settlement revenues deposited in fund within 30 days of receipt, Finance Director to notify each agency of allocation, appropriations conditional on tobacco revenues, appropriation of additional tobacco settlement funds, audit, Children's Affairs Department to report to Legislature and Children's Policy Council, appropriations from General Fund to various entities contingent upon adoption of const. amend. proposed by SB147, 2012 Reg. Sess.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-11-07 - Senate - Dial tabled table to reconsider third reading (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - Senate - Motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - House - Barton motion to Table (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-24 Forwarded to Governor on May 24, 2012 at 2:47 a. m. on May 24, 2012.
2012-05-24 Assigned Act No. 2012-600.
2012-05-24 Clerk of the House Certification
2012-05-24 Enrolled
2012-05-24 Signature Requested
2012-05-24 Dial tabled table to reconsider third reading adopted Roll Call 33.
2012-05-24 Passed Second House
2012-05-24 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 32
2012-05-24 Motion to Miscellaneous adopted Roll Call 31
2012-05-24 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-23 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-05-22 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2012-05-21 Engrossed
2012-05-21 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 21
2012-05-21 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 20
2012-05-21 Barton Amendment Offered
2012-05-21 Barton motion to Table adopted Roll Call 19
2012-05-21 Ways and Means General Fund Amendment Offered
2012-05-21 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-18 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2012-05-17 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB25
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB25-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452239&VOTE=19&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452241&VOTE=20&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452242&VOTE=21&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452755&VOTE=31&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452756&VOTE=32&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452762&VOTE=33&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback