AL HB248 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 8:42 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Education, public K-12 school sporting events, broadcast authorized

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education, public K-12 school sporting events, broadcast authorized

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1327 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - SBIR: Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 1326 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 645 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 644 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Rich motion to Table Roll Call 643 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - HBIR: Rich motion to Adopt Roll Call 642 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 8:42 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
2021-05-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2021-452.
2021-05-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2021-05-04SenateSignature Requested
2021-05-04HouseEnrolled
2021-05-04HousePassed Second House
2021-05-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1327
2021-05-04SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-04-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-04-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
2021-04-01HouseEngrossed
2021-04-01HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 645
2021-04-01HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 644
2021-04-01HouseRich Amendment Offered
2021-04-01HouseRich motion to Table adopted Roll Call 643
2021-04-01HouseEducation Policy Amendment Offered
2021-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed
2021-03-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2021-02-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy

Same As/Similar To

SB127 (Same As) 2021-05-04 - Indefinitely Postponed

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB248&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB248-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB248-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB248-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/211505-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/212287-1.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41700.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42324.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42676.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=654830&VOTE=642&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20HB248&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=654834&VOTE=643&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=654846&VOTE=644&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=654849&VOTE=645&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=663414&VOTE=1326&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20HB248&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=663416&VOTE=1327&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments 750

feedback