AL HB248 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 3:53 p.m. on May 7, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 3:53 p.m. on May 7, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clay Co. Community Corrections Program, director and employees, power of arrest under certain conditions
Title
Clay Co. Community Corrections Program, director and employees, power of arrest under certain conditions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 64 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2019-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 64 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:53 p.m. on May 7, 2019. |
2019-05-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-159. |
2019-05-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-02 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 491 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Livingston motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-04 | House | Johnson and Hurst intended to vote "yea" |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-04-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 95 |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |