AL HB241 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Delivered to Governor at 2:47 p.m. on May 8, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Delivered to Governor at 2:47 p.m. on May 8, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Landscape Architects, Board of Examiners of, violations by licensees, maximum fine increased to $2,500 per violation, license application fee increased, Secs. 34-17-5, 34-17-25 am'd.
Title
Landscape Architects, Board of Examiners of, violations by licensees, maximum fine increased to $2,500 per violation, license application fee increased, Secs. 34-17-5, 34-17-25 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:47 p.m. on May 8, 2019. |
2019-05-08 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-186. |
2019-05-08 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-07 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 611 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2019-04-23 | House | Shaver intended to vote "Yea" |
2019-04-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 310 |
2019-04-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 309 |
2019-04-23 | House | Wingo Amendment Offered |
2019-04-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |