AL HB24 | 2016 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-25 - Delivered to Governor at 1:17 p.m. on August 25, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Lawrence Co., revenue commissioner, office budgetary operations merged, expenses financed on pro rata share basis from state, county, and municipal ad valorem tax

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lawrence Co., revenue commissioner, office budgetary operations merged, expenses financed on pro rata share basis from state, county, and municipal ad valorem tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-24 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 59 Abs: 20) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-25HouseDelivered to Governor at 1:17 p.m. on August 25, 2016.
2016-08-25HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-448.
2016-08-25HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-08-25SenateSignature Requested
2016-08-24HouseEnrolled
2016-08-24HousePassed Second House
2016-08-24SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 61
2016-08-24SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-08-19SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-08-18SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2016-08-18HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 30
2016-08-18HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-08-17HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-08-15HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback