AL HB23 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Pending third reading on day 15 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Criminal procedure, provide that a judge may use discretion in the length of sentence a defendant must serve if his or her probation is revoked, Sec. 15-18-8 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure, provide that a judge may use discretion in the length of sentence a defendant must serve if his or her probation is revoked, Sec. 15-18-8 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 107 (Y: 84 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 106 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 105 (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - HBIR: Hill motion to Adopt Roll Call 104 (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11SenatePending third reading on day 15 Favorable from Judiciary
2021-03-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-02-24SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2021-02-23HouseEngrossed
2021-02-23HouseTreadaway intended to vote "Yea"
2021-02-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 107
2021-02-23HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 106
2021-02-23HouseChestnut Amendment Offered
2021-02-23HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 105
2021-02-23HouseHill Amendment Offered
2021-02-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2021-02-04HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-02-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15188Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB23&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB23-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB23-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/210562-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/210703-1.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41493.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42190.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=646216&VOTE=104&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20HB23&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=646241&VOTE=105&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=646247&VOTE=106&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=646248&VOTE=107&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback