AL HB222 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-25 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Monroe Co., court costs, additional in circuit and district court cases, distrib. to circuit clerk, district attorney, and judiciary

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Monroe Co., court costs, additional in circuit and district court cases, distrib. to circuit clerk, district attorney, and judiciary

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 75 Abs: 10) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-25SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2018-01-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 73
2018-01-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-16HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback