AL HB22 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-24 - Delivered to Governor at 10:47 a.m. on August 24, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-24 - Delivered to Governor at 10:47 a.m. on August 24, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Banking Dept., approp. from the Banking Assessment Fees Fund for fiscal year ending September 30, 2017.
Title
Banking Dept., approp. from the Banking Assessment Fees Fund for fiscal year ending September 30, 2017.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-24 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:47 a.m. on August 24, 2016. |
2016-08-24 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-451. |
2016-08-24 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-08-23 | House | Enrolled |
2016-08-23 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 50 |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism and Marketing |
2016-08-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 18 |
2016-08-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-08-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-08-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |