AL HB202 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Grand juries, remove grand jury witnesses from certain provisions limiting disclosure of testimony, court reporter or stenographer required to record grand jury proceedings, Secs. 12-16-215, 12-16-216 am'd.
Title
Grand juries, remove grand jury witnesses from certain provisions limiting disclosure of testimony, court reporter or stenographer required to record grand jury proceedings, Secs. 12-16-215, 12-16-216 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Ball [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1069 (Y: 71 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 1068 (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - HBIR: Ball motion to Adopt Roll Call 1067 (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 1068 (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - HBIR: Ball motion to Adopt Roll Call 1067 (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Judiciary |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2021-04-29 | House | Engrossed |
2021-04-29 | House | Rowe intended to vote "Nay" |
2021-04-29 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1069 |
2021-04-29 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1068 |
2021-04-29 | House | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2021-04-29 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-27 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 16 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
12 | 16 | 216 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |