AL HB20 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Delivered to Governor at 6:49 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Driver's licenses, Stage II, 16 year olds, minimum of behind-the-wheel driving practice hours increased from 30 to 50 hours, Sec. 32-6-7.2 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver's licenses, Stage II, 16 year olds, minimum of behind-the-wheel driving practice hours increased from 30 to 50 hours, Sec. 32-6-7.2 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-10 - House - Hanes motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-08-10 - Senate - Motion to Read Again a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-08-10 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-08-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 32) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-10HouseDelivered to Governor at 6:49 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
2015-08-10HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-516.
2015-08-10HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-08-10HouseEnrolled
2015-08-10SenateSignature Requested
2015-08-10SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2015-08-10HouseHanes motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 44
2015-08-10HouseConcurrence Requested
2015-08-10SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 64
2015-08-10SenateHoltzclaw motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 63
2015-08-10SenateHoltzclaw Amendment Offered
2015-08-10SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-08-10SenateLivingston motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-10SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2015-08-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2015-08-06HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 27
2015-08-06HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-08-04HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback