AL HB194 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Read for the second time and rereferred to committee Finance and Taxation General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Read for the second time and rereferred to committee Finance and Taxation General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Class 2 municipality, Medicaid Agency, Program of All Inclusive Care for Elderly (PACE), allotment of minimum of 200 participates beginning fiscal year 2020.
Title
Class 2 municipality, Medicaid Agency, Program of All Inclusive Care for Elderly (PACE), allotment of minimum of 200 participates beginning fiscal year 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and rereferred to committee Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Mobile County Legislation |
2019-04-18 | House | Brown (C) intended to vote "Yea" |
2019-04-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 243 |
2019-04-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation |