AL HB187 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Law enforcement, definition of working day for purposes of subsistence allowance clarified, Sec. 36-21-2 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law enforcement, definition of working day for purposes of subsistence allowance clarified, Sec. 36-21-2 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2018-02-22HouseEngrossed
2018-02-22HouseColeman intended to vote "Yea"
2018-02-22HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 449
2018-02-22HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 448
2018-02-22HouseJackson Amendment Offered
2018-02-22HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 447
2018-02-22HousePublic Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered
2018-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-01-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback