AL HB184 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to charitable organizations; to amend Section 13A-9-71, Code of Alabama 1975, to prohibit the imposition of certain filing or reporting requirements on certain charitable organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to charitable organizations; to amend Section 13A-9-71, Code of Alabama 1975, to prohibit the imposition of certain filing or reporting requirements on certain charitable organizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-18 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-23HouseEnacted
2023-05-23HouseEnrolled
2023-05-23SenateReady to Enroll
2023-05-18SenateRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-05-18SenateOn Third Reading in Second House
2023-05-11SenateRead Second Time in Second House
2023-05-10SenateReported Out of Committee in Second House
2023-05-10SenateReported Favorably from Senate State Governmental Affairs
2023-04-25SenateReferred to Committee to Senate State Governmental Affairs
2023-04-25HouseRead First Time in Second House
2023-04-20HouseRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-04-20HouseOn Third Reading in House of Origin
2023-04-05HouseRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-04-05HouseReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-04-05HouseReported Favorably from House State Government
2023-03-22HouseIntroduced and Referred to House State Government
2023-03-22HouseRead First Time in House of Origin

Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback