AL HB18 | 2016 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 23 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-07 - Died in House Basket w/Executive Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles, commercial vehicles with three or more axels, interstate highways and four-lane highways, outside of municipal corporate limits, required to use right lanes under certain conditions, exception for passing, Sec. 32-5A-80 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles, commercial vehicles with three or more axels, interstate highways and four-lane highways, outside of municipal corporate limits, required to use right lanes under certain conditions, exception for passing, Sec. 32-5A-80 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 73 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2016-08-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 61 Abs: 16) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-07HouseDied in House Basket w/Executive Veto
2016-08-23HouseForwarded to Governor on August 23, 2016 at 3:15 p.m. on August 23, 2016.
2016-08-23HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-08-23HouseEnrolled
2016-08-23SenateSignature Requested
2016-08-19HousePassed Second House
2016-08-19SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 24
2016-08-19SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-08-18SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-08-17SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2016-08-17HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 4
2016-08-17HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-08-16HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-08-15HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback