AL HB18 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Delivered to Governor at 6:49 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Sales tax transactions, possession or use of automated sales suppression devices or phantom-ware to delete sales from cash register records, prohibited, criminal penalties, Sec. 40-29-121 added; Sec. 40-29-119 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales tax transactions, possession or use of automated sales suppression devices or phantom-ware to delete sales from cash register records, prohibited, criminal penalties, Sec. 40-29-121 added; Sec. 40-29-119 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-10 - Senate - Livingston motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-08-10 - House - McMillan motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 23 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2015-08-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-08-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-08-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-10HouseDelivered to Governor at 6:49 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
2015-08-10Senate
2015-08-10HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-502.
2015-08-10HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-08-10HouseEnrolled
2015-08-10SenateSignature Requested
2015-08-10HouseSouth intended to vote "Yea"
2015-08-10HouseMcMillan motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 43
2015-08-10HouseConcurrence Requested
2015-08-10SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 55
2015-08-10SenateLivingston motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 54
2015-08-10SenateLivingston Amendment Offered
2015-08-10SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-08-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2015-08-05HouseEngrossed
2015-08-05HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 16
2015-08-05HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 15
2015-08-05HouseWays and Means Education Amendment Offered
2015-08-05HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-08-04HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-08-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB18
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015FS/PrintFiles/HB18-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=528509&VOTE=15&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1066&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=528510&VOTE=16&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1066&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=529408&VOTE=55&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1066&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=529477&VOTE=43&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1066&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=529407&VOTE=54&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1066&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback