AL HB177 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 9:49 a.m. on April 22, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 9:49 a.m. on April 22, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Municipalities, electronic records and signatures authorized by ordinance, Secs. 8-1A-17, 8-1A-18 am'd.
Title
Municipalities, electronic records and signatures authorized by ordinance, Secs. 8-1A-17, 8-1A-18 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1066 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SBIR: Givhan motion to Adopt Roll Call 1065 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 360 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 359 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - HBIR: Reynolds motion to Adopt Roll Call 358 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SBIR: Givhan motion to Adopt Roll Call 1065 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 360 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 359 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - HBIR: Reynolds motion to Adopt Roll Call 358 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:49 a.m. on April 22, 2021. |
2021-04-22 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-304. |
2021-04-22 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-20 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1066 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2021-03-11 | House | Engrossed |
2021-03-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 360 |
2021-03-11 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 359 |
2021-03-11 | House | County and Municipal Government Amendment Offered |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 1A | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
8 | 1A | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |