AL HB177 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Forwarded to Governor on March 15, 2018 at 1:46 p.m. on March 15, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Talladega College, appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Talladega College, appropriation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HouseForwarded to Governor on March 15, 2018 at 1:46 p.m. on March 15, 2018.
2018-03-15HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-283.
2018-03-15HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-15HouseEnrolled
2018-03-15SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-15HousePassed Second House
2018-03-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 836
2018-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-08SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-13SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2018-02-13HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 309
2018-02-13HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback