AL HB177 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-02 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Ethics and Elections
Pending: Senate Constitution, Ethics and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-02 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Ethics and Elections
Pending: Senate Constitution, Ethics and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, notification of absentee voter of defective and uncounted ballot, Sec. 17-11-10 am'd.
Title
Elections, notification of absentee voter of defective and uncounted ballot, Sec. 17-11-10 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Ball [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Ethics and Elections |
2015-04-21 | House | Engrossed |
2015-04-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 443 |
2015-04-21 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 442 |
2015-04-21 | House | Drummond Amendment Offered |
2015-04-21 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 441 |
2015-04-21 | House | Constitution, Campaigns and Elections Amendment Offered |
2015-04-21 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |