AL HB170 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tallapoosa County, Jackson's Gap, boundary lines altered
Title
Tallapoosa County, Jackson's Gap, boundary lines altered
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Oliver [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 848 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 84 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-03-05 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 34 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 84 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-03-05 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 34 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | House | Enacted |
2024-05-07 | House | Enacted |
2024-04-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2024-04-30 | House | Enrolled |
2024-04-30 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 848 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Pending Senate Local Legislation |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation |
2024-03-05 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 186 |
2024-03-05 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-29 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-29 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-14 | House | Pending House Local Legislation |
2024-02-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Local Legislation |